MA S970 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require recordkeeping at public construction worksites in order to protect first responders. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Requiring recordkeeping at public construction worksites in order to protect first responders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-07-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S919 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S854 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1000 (Similar To) 2016-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4604
S1694 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1681 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1669 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1705 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1730 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1650 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S884 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2785 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2788 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
S1499 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S854 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1000 (Similar To) 2016-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4604
S1694 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1681 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1669 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1705 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1730 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1650 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S884 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2785 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2788 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
S1499 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S970 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S970.pdf |