MA S972 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to permissible topics of collective bargaining. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to permissible topics of collective bargaining
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-05-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/26/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1628 (Similar To) 2015-10-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1644 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S985 (Similar To) 2015-10-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2023
S1425 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S188 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S536 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2232
S1339 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1363 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S2225 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 340 of the Acts of 2016
S1402 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1390 (Similar To) 2016-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1585 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1379 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S440 (Similar To) 2016-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2241
S1644 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S985 (Similar To) 2015-10-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2023
S1425 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S188 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S536 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2232
S1339 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1363 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S2225 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 340 of the Acts of 2016
S1402 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1390 (Similar To) 2016-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1585 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1379 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S440 (Similar To) 2016-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2241
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S972 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S972.pdf |