MA S985 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to regulate the use of credit reports by employers. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Regulating the use of credit reports by employers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Accompanied by S1031 |
2017-03-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/04/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1031 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied S985
H2372 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied H3153
H3153 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2372 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied H3153
H3153 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S985 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S985.pdf |