MA S987 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H1418
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-29 - Accompanied H1418
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-29 - Accompanied H1418
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create a special commission to promote a recovery-focus in the mental health system
Title
Resolve to create a special commission to promote a recovery-focus in the mental health system
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-29 | House | Accompanied H1418 |
2011-05-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2011 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse |
Same As/Similar To
H1418 (Replaced by) 2012-12-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4533
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S987 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13309&generalCourtId=1 |