MA S991 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2496
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide a DNA exception for statute of limitations on sex offenses. The Judiciary.
Title
To provide a DNA exception for statute of limitations on sex offenses
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Montigny [D] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] | Sen. Michael Brady [D] | Rep. Hannah Kane [R] |
Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2496 |
2019-11-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H3309 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S987 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S859 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S980 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S920 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H1489 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2496 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S987 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S859 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S980 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S920 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H1489 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2496 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S991 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S991.pdf |