MD HB1003 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 696
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 696
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a plat in Montgomery County to be drawn, recorded, and maintained in electronic form in a manner approved by the State Archivist.
Title
Montgomery County - Clerk of the Circuit Court - Plat Recordation PG/MC 110-24
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 696 |
2024-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-16 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Archives
Clerks of Court
Counties - Generally
Electronic Documents
Electronic Government
Land Records
Local Government Mandates
Montgomery County
Real Property
Recordation
Clerks of Court
Counties - Generally
Electronic Documents
Electronic Government
Land Records
Local Government Mandates
Montgomery County
Real Property
Recordation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 3 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |