MD HB101 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of One Billion, Ninety-Two Million, One Hundred Ninety-Four Thousand Dollars ($1,092,194,000), the proceeds to be used for certain necessary building, construction, demolition, planning, renovation, conversion, replacement, and capital equipment purchases of the State, for acquiring certain real estate in connection therewith, and for grants to certain subdivisions and other organizations for certain development and improvement purposes; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2019, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2009, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, and 2018
Sponsors
Del. The Speaker [?] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Conference Committee Report Adopted (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Peters) Adopted (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-4) (Y: 134 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-4) (Y: 131 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Peters) Adopted (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-4) (Y: 134 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-4) (Y: 131 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 14 |
2019-03-27 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted (46-0) |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-4) |
2019-03-27 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2019-03-26 | Senate | (Senators Elfreth, Guzzone and McCray) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate advisors: |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senators Peters, King, Zucker, Ferguson, and Edwards |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede |
2019-03-26 | House | (Delegates Haynes, McKay and Korman) |
2019-03-26 | House | House advisors: |
2019-03-26 | House | Delegates Jones, Gaines, B. Barnes, Ghrist, and McIntosh |
2019-03-26 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-03-26 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2019-03-26 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Peters) Adopted (47-0) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#81-94) Adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#80) Adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#18-79) Adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#13-17) Adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#7-12) Adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#2-6) Adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Peters) Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-4) |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee Amendment (#71-77) Adopted |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee Amendment (#67-70) Adopted |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee Amendment (#65-66) Adopted |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee Amendment (#21-64) Adopted |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee Amendment (#14-20) Adopted |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee Amendment (#7-13) Adopted |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee Amendment (#2-6) Adopted |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted |
2019-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments |
2019-03-18 | House | Special Order until 03/19 (Delegate Jones) Adopted |
2019-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments |
2019-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2019-01-18 | House | First Reading Appropriations |