MD HB1019 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Public Service Commission to adopt regulations requiring electric companies and electric cooperatives to adopt a method for an electricity supplier enrolling a certain customer to provide certain information to adequately identify the customer without using the customer's account number; requiring the regulations to require that a certain customer enrolling with an electricity supplier may offer certain information as proof of identity under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Public Service Commission - Electric Companies and Electric Cooperatives - Customer Identification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2020-02-19 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB529 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Subjects
Consumer Protection
Cooperative Associations
Energy Matters
Identification
Privacy
Public Service Commission
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Vital Records
Cooperative Associations
Energy Matters
Identification
Privacy
Public Service Commission
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Vital Records
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |