MD HB1022 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the prohibition against issuing a Class D beer, wine, and liquor license in Prince George's County; establishing a Class D (waterfront) beer, wine, and liquor license that the Board of License Commissioners of the County may issue to an establishment in a waterfront entertainment retail complex; establishing the privileges for the license; authorizing dancing and entertainment activities on the licensed premises in a specified manner; providing for the hours of operation of the licensed premises; etc.
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D (Waterfront) Beer, Wine, and Liquor License PG 315-16
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2016-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | Reassigned to Economic Matters |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Blue Laws
Boundaries
Fees
Food
Laws and Ordinances
License Commissioners, Boards of
Prince George's County
Retail Sales
Time
Water
Zoning and Planning
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Blue Laws
Boundaries
Fees
Food
Laws and Ordinances
License Commissioners, Boards of
Prince George's County
Retail Sales
Time
Water
Zoning and Planning