MD HB1024 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force on Traffic Patterns and Infrastructure on MD Route 45 (York Road) to study and make recommendations on traffic patterns, infrastructure, street parking, bicycle lanes, sidewalk width, and signage on York Road; and requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Senate Education, Health and Environmental Committee and the House Environment and Transportation Committee on or before December 31, 2023.
Title
Task Force on Traffic Patterns and Infrastructure on MD Route 45 (York Road)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-02-23 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB584 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-28 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Boundaries
Examinations
Highways
Investigations and Inquiries
Reports
Signs and Billboards
State Highway Administration
Sunset
Traffic Regulation
Transportation - Highways
Examinations
Highways
Investigations and Inquiries
Reports
Signs and Billboards
State Highway Administration
Sunset
Traffic Regulation
Transportation - Highways