MD HB1034 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from one to three the number of assistant sheriffs required to be appointed by the Baltimore City Sheriff; authorizing the Baltimore City Sheriff to appoint social workers and any additional sworn or civilian personnel if the funding for the personnel is provided in the ordinance of estimates or any other source; and applying the Act to all full-time sworn law enforcement officers who are deputy sheriffs at the rank of lieutenant or below and court security officers.
Title
Baltimore City Sheriff - Staffing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202 |
2024-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2024-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {923426/1 Adopted |
2024-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2024-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB1160 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-11 - First Reading Senate Rules
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 2 | 316 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |