MD HB1070 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing, in the City of College Park, the granting of a license to sell alcoholic beverages in a specified building located more than 400 feet from a school building if the land on which the proposed licensed establishment is located is in a commercial district; and making stylistic changes.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - City of College Park - Sales by License Holders Near School Buildings PG 309-13
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144 |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2013-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {593895/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2013-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Churches
Municipal Corporations
Private Schools
Public Schools
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Churches
Municipal Corporations
Private Schools
Public Schools