MD HB1071 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-05 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-05 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of Public Safety and Correctional Facilities, with the advice of the Secretary of Health, to update certain minimum mandatory standards for inmate food services to reflect certain practices and guidelines, by January 1, 2022, and at least every 5 years thereafter; requiring that certain minimum standards include a procedure for an inmate to elect to change to certain food and beverage options without requiring a certain exception; etc.
Title
Health - Health and Wellness Standards - Correctional Facilities and Health Care Facilities
Sponsors
Del. Terri Hill [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Judiciary) |
2021-02-10 | House | Hearing canceled (Judiciary) |
2021-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2021-02-05 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB322 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-31 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Communications
Continuing Education
Contracts
Correctional Institutions
Equipment
Food
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Job Training
Minorities
Prices
Prisoners
Public Health
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Communications
Continuing Education
Contracts
Correctional Institutions
Equipment
Food
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Job Training
Minorities
Prices
Prisoners
Public Health
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 21 | 1301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 21 | 1302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |