MD HB1076 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to issue an electronic or digital 24-hour registration authorizing an owner of a vehicle to operate the vehicle on a highway in the State.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electronic or Digital 24-Hour Registration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Electronic Government
Fees
internet
Laws and Ordinances
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Rules and Regulations
Time
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Regulation
Fees
internet
Laws and Ordinances
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Rules and Regulations
Time
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 13 | 405.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |