MD HB1099 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain veterinary practitioners and veterinary technicians to compound prescription drugs under certain circumstances; requiring a veterinary clinic or hospital that carries out compounding to establish certain policies and keep certain records regarding certain compounded prescription drugs; authorizing an office manager or veterinary assistant to maintain certain records in a certain manner and update certain policies under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Veterinary Practitioners and Veterinary Technicians - Compounding Prescription Drugs - Authorization and Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2024-02-23 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Agriculture
Animals
Committees and Commissions
Drugs
Examinations
Health Occupations
Job Training
Medical Treatments
Notices
Records
Safety
Standards and Best Practices
Storage
Veterinarians
Weights and Measures
Animals
Committees and Commissions
Drugs
Examinations
Health Occupations
Job Training
Medical Treatments
Notices
Records
Safety
Standards and Best Practices
Storage
Veterinarians
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Agriculture | 2 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 2 | 313.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |