MD HB1101 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1067
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain funding to be provided to community colleges in fiscal year 2024 and each fiscal year thereafter; and requiring certain funding to be provided to private nonprofit institutions of higher education in fiscal year 2024 and in fiscal year 2025 and each fiscal year thereafter.
Title
Community Colleges and Private Nonprofit Institutions of Higher Education – Funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-10 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB795 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-22 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1067 (Carry Over) 2021-02-21 - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
HB1067 (Carry Over) 2021-02-21 - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Appropriations
Community Colleges
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Revenue and Taxes
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Weights and Measures
Community Colleges
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Revenue and Taxes
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 16 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 16 | 512 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 17 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1101?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb1101f.pdf |