MD HB1107 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the termination provisions of a specified job creation tax credit earned by a qualified business entity under specified circumstances.
Title
Job Creation Tax Credit - Termination Provisions
Sponsors
Del. Sam Arora [D] | Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Del. John Bohanan [D] | Del. Steven DeBoy [D] |
Sen. Mary James [D] | Del. Patrick McDonough [R] | Del. John Olszewski [D] | Del. Michael Weir [D] |
Del. John Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-09 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2012-04-07 | Re-referred Budget and Taxation | |
2012-04-01 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2012-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2012-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (129-1) | |
2012-04-01 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-04-01 | Favorable with Amendments 335061/2 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing 3/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Commercial Rehabilitation
Community Development
Income Tax
Sunset
Tax Credits
Work, Labor and Employment
Commercial Rehabilitation
Community Development
Income Tax
Sunset
Tax Credits
Work, Labor and Employment