MD HB1110 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-12)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-12)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education, in consultation with the Maryland Department of Health, by June 1, 2019, to develop health and safety best practices for the use of digital devices in school classrooms; and requiring the Department, by July 1, 2019, to provide the best practices to each county board and nonpublic school for consideration and adoption.
Title
Public Schools – Health and Safety Best Practices – Digital Devices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244 |
2018-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-29 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2018-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2018-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments {855867/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Curriculum
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Health
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Health
Public Schools
Safety
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Health
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Health
Public Schools
Safety
Telecommunications and Information Technology