MD HB1112 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that a person that applies for a certificate of public convenience and necessity in response to a certain order is eligible for an expedited review process of the application; requiring the Public Service Commission to give priority to the review of and final action on certain applications for a certificate of public convenience and necessity; subjecting certain contracts entered into under the Act to a certain project labor agreement; etc.
Title
Public Service Commission - Energy Storage Devices - Acquisition and Deployment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (101-37) |
2024-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {343924/1 Adopted |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2024-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Apprentices
Certifications
Construction
Contractors
Contracts
Energy Matters
Equipment
Federal Government
Forms
Notices
Power Plants
Prices
Procurement
Public Service Commission
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Storage
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Work, Labor, and Employment
Certifications
Construction
Contractors
Contracts
Energy Matters
Equipment
Federal Government
Forms
Notices
Power Plants
Prices
Procurement
Public Service Commission
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Storage
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 216.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |