MD HB112 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists to issue cease and desist orders or obtain injunctive relief for violations of specified provisions of law; altering a specified penalty; providing that a person who violates specified provisions of law is subject to a civil fine not exceeding $50,000 to be assessed by the Board in accordance with specified regulations; etc.
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Cease and Desist Orders and Penalties for Misrepresentation and Practicing Without a License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-10 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2014-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {446785/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-13 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counselors
Discipline
Fines
Fraud
Health Occupations
Penalties and Sentences
Revenue and Taxes
Counselors
Discipline
Fines
Fraud
Health Occupations
Penalties and Sentences
Revenue and Taxes