MD HB112 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Hearing 4/02 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Hearing 4/02 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from causing the serious physical injury or death of a vulnerable individual as a result of the person operating a vehicle in a careless or distracted manner or in violation of any other rules of the road provisions of the Maryland Vehicle Law; establishing that a person convicted of a violation of the Act may be fined up to $2,000 and must appear in court and may not prepay the fine; establishing additional penalties of participation in a motor vehicle safety course and up to 150 hours of community service; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (141-0) |
2019-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {640816/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-18 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Accidents
Agriculture
Animals
Bicycles
Courts
Death
Disabilities
Driver Education
Drivers' Licenses
Emergencies
Equipment
Fines
Highways
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motorcycles, Mopeds and Motor Scooters
Pedestrians
Penalties and Sentences
Public Employees
Sidewalks
Time
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Utilities
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Agriculture
Animals
Bicycles
Courts
Death
Disabilities
Driver Education
Drivers' Licenses
Emergencies
Equipment
Fines
Highways
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motorcycles, Mopeds and Motor Scooters
Pedestrians
Penalties and Sentences
Public Employees
Sidewalks
Time
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Utilities
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road