MD HB1128 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Talent Innovation Program in the Maryland Department of Labor to increase access to high-quality job training by using innovative and sustainable talent financing mechanisms to help meet skill needs in the State's prominent and emerging industry sectors; and requiring the Department, beginning on January 1, 2025, and each January 1 thereafter, to report to the Governor, the President of the Senate and Speaker of the House on Program activities and use of the Talent Innovation Fund.
Title
Labor and Employment – Workforce Development – Talent Innovation Program and Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 103 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 104 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 104 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421 |
2024-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (103-35) |
2024-04-08 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Senate Refuses Recede |
2024-04-06 | Senate | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Qi, Boafo and Wivell) |
2024-04-06 | Senate | House Requests Senate Recede |
2024-04-06 | Senate | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2024-04-05 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Qi, Boafo and Wivell) |
2024-04-05 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2024-04-05 | House | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (35-12) |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {663524/1 Adopted |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (104-35) |
2024-03-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2024-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Apprentices
Artificial Intelligence
Cybersecurity
Grants
Health Occupations
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Pilot Programs
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Recruitment and Hiring
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Aid
Work, Labor, and Employment
Artificial Intelligence
Cybersecurity
Grants
Health Occupations
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Pilot Programs
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Recruitment and Hiring
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Aid
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 11 | 1601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 1602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 1603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 1604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |