MD HB1134 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified manufacturers of lead pigment to reimburse specified persons for damages caused by lead-based paint; establishing the types of damages caused by the presence of lead-based paint in residential buildings for which manufacturers of lead pigment are liable to specified persons; creating the Lead Paint Restitution Fund; etc.
Title
Maryland Lead Poisoning Recovery Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn | |
2012-02-28 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-16 | Re-assigned Judiciary | |
2012-02-16 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-13 | Hearing 3/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Appropriations
Attorney General
Attorneys
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Damages
Environment, Department of
Evidence
Governor
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Housing
Judgments
Liability
Liens
Medical Assistance
Minors
Negligence
Notices
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Attorney General
Attorneys
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Damages
Environment, Department of
Evidence
Governor
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Housing
Judgments
Liability
Liens
Medical Assistance
Minors
Negligence
Notices
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB1134.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb1134f.pdf |