MD HB1135 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain regulated financial institutions to develop a community benefit plan in connection with certain applications to the Commissioner of Financial Regulation relating to financial services; requiring the Commissioner to exercise certain oversight authority relating to the adequacy of the community benefit plans and attainment of goals under the plans; establishing the Community Reinvestment Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund to finance certain community development activities; etc.
Title
Financial Institutions - Community Benefit Plan Act of 2024
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2024-02-27 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Assessments
Boundaries
Charters
Civil Offenses
Civil Rights and Social Equity
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Community Facilities and Services
Contracts
Credit
Data
Electronic Documents
Environmental Justice
Federal Government
Fees
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Forms
Housing
Licenses
Loans
Low-Income
Mergers and Acquisitions
Notices
Open Government
Penalties and Sentences
Public Information
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Signs and Billboards
Standards and Best Practices
studies
Time
Unfair Trade Practices
Boundaries
Charters
Civil Offenses
Civil Rights and Social Equity
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Community Facilities and Services
Contracts
Credit
Data
Electronic Documents
Environmental Justice
Federal Government
Fees
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Forms
Housing
Licenses
Loans
Low-Income
Mergers and Acquisitions
Notices
Open Government
Penalties and Sentences
Public Information
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Signs and Billboards
Standards and Best Practices
studies
Time
Unfair Trade Practices
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Financial Institutions | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 1 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 1 | 502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 1 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 1 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 1 | 505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 1 | 506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 1 | 507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 11 | 503.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 2 | 118 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 2 | 118.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 2 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 5 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 6 | 712 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |