MD HB115 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the authority of a police officer without a warrant to arrest a person suspected of committing a specified theft crime.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrests - Theft Crimes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-25 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-25 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-02-17 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-28 | Returned Passed | |
2012-02-16 | Third Reading Passed (132-3) | |
2012-02-14 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-02-14 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-02-13 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2012-01-19 | Hearing 2/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-20 | First Reading Judiciary |