MD HB115 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB684
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 758
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 758
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a certain commitment unit to include in a notification given to a victim, victim's representative, or witness regarding the release from confinement of a sentenced defendant or child respondent the telephone number of the Maryland Crime Victims Resource Center.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims' Rights - Notification of Release From Confinement (Jaycee Webster Victims' Rights Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 758 |
2024-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2024-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {823524/1 Adopted |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2024-01-16 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2023-09-11 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB684 (Carry Over) 2023-03-22 - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
SB4 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-21 - Referred Judiciary
SB4 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-21 - Referred Judiciary
Subjects
Correctional Institutions
Corrections
Criminal Law - Procedures
Notices
Pretrial Detention or Release
Victims
Witnesses
Corrections
Criminal Law - Procedures
Notices
Pretrial Detention or Release
Victims
Witnesses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 11 | 508 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |