MD HB1155 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for income from the discharge of indebtedness related to specified costs incurred with respect to a principal residence; providing that the subtraction may not exceed $100,000 for an individual and $200,000 for a married couple filing jointly or specified individuals; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016, but before January 1, 2019; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2017-04-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2017-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |