MD HB1155 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 885
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 885
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring hospitals to establish and maintain certain protocols and capacity related to the treatment of patients who are being treated for an opioid-related overdose or opioid-related emergency medical condition; requiring hospitals to make a referral for patients who are diagnosed with opioid use disorder or administered or prescribed medication for opioid use disorder to an appropriate provider to voluntarily continue treatment in the community and work with peer support professionals for a certain purpose; etc.
Title
Hospitals - Opioid Overdose and Opioid-Related Emergency Medical Conditions - Treatment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 885 |
2024-04-05 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2024-04-05 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {813427/1 Adopted |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-0) |
2024-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {973521/1 Adopted |
2024-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB1071 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 886
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Emergencies
Governor
Health
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Hospitals
Job Training
Notices
Opioids
Public Health
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Standards and Best Practices
studies
Substance Abuse
Substance Abuse Treatment
Treasurers
Budgets
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Emergencies
Governor
Health
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Hospitals
Job Training
Notices
Opioids
Public Health
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Standards and Best Practices
studies
Substance Abuse
Substance Abuse Treatment
Treasurers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 308.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |