MD HB1168 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education, the Maryland Higher Education Commission, and the University System of Maryland to study and make recommendations on strategies to increase and improve minority teacher recruitment, preparation, development, and retention in elementary and secondary education in the State; requiring the Department, Commission, and System jointly to submit a specified report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2013; etc.
Title
Education - Minority Teacher Recruitment - Study and Report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-2) (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-2) (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2013-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-2) |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {485360/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2013-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Education, State Department of
Higher Education Commission
Minorities
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment
Higher Education Commission
Minorities
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment