MD HB1180 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering eligibility for a certain property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on certain residential real property located within a certain airport noise zone; authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to choose to provide the tax credit only within a certain noise contour; authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to vary the amount of the credit based on where the property is situated within the noise zone; etc.
Title
Property Tax Credit - Airport Noise Zones - Eligibility
Sponsors
Del. Terri Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 109 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Floor Amendment 453028/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (Y: 39 N: 92 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 109 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Floor Amendment 453028/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (Y: 39 N: 92 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340 |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment {799632/1 Withdrawn |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Committee Amendment (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {799632/1 Adopted |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (109-28) |
2021-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-17 | House | Floor Amendment {453028/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (39-92) |
2021-03-16 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Clark) Adopted |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {655060/1 Adopted |
2021-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2021-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB849 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Subjects
Airports
Boundaries
Counties
Municipal Corporations
Noise
Property Tax
Residential Property
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Boundaries
Counties
Municipal Corporations
Noise
Property Tax
Residential Property
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 9 | 216 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |