MD HB1182 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Stepping Up to Reduce Mental Illness in Correctional Facilities Commission; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; prohibiting a member of the Commission from receiving certain compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of certain expenses; requiring the Commission to study and make recommendations relating to reducing the number of individuals with mental illness in correctional facilities in the State; etc.
Title
Maryland Stepping Up to Reduce Mental Illness in Correctional Facilities Commission
Sponsors
Del. Erek Barron [D] | Del. David Moon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2019-03-08 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Institutions
Counties
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Prisoners
Public Health
Public Safety
Repeate Offenders
Reports
Sunset
Correctional Institutions
Counties
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Prisoners
Public Health
Public Safety
Repeate Offenders
Reports
Sunset