MD HB1201 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Smart Growth Subcabinet to meet at least biannually with specified individuals to discuss specified local government issues; prohibiting use of the State Development Plan to deny a State-issued permit or specified State funding; etc.
Title
Department of Planning - State Development Plan - Use and Conflicts of Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (45-1) | |
2012-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-07 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-19 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-04 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (133-5) | |
2012-03-17 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-17 | Favorable with Amendments 750311/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-02-13 | Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Appropriations
Counties
Environmental Matters
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Municipal Corporations
Planning, Department of
Rules and Regulations
Sewage
Smart Growth, Office of
State Aid
Transportation
Water
Zoning and Planning
Counties
Environmental Matters
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Municipal Corporations
Planning, Department of
Rules and Regulations
Sewage
Smart Growth, Office of
State Aid
Transportation
Water
Zoning and Planning