MD HB1211 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 66
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 66
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a certain exemption from certain reemployed retiree earnings offsets for certain retirees of the Employees' and Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems; repealing certain requirements that certain participating employers pay certain offsets under certain circumstances; establishing an exemption from a reemployed retiree earnings offset for retirees of the Teachers' Pension System who are reemployed by certain employers if the retiree's salary is funded from certain sources; etc.
Title
Employees' and Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment of Retirees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 66 |
2024-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2024-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {273428/1 Adopted |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2024-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB366 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Education, Boards of
Notices
Retirement
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Sunset
Teachers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Education, Boards of
Notices
Retirement
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Sunset
Teachers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 22 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 23 | 407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |