MD HB1217 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-10 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-10 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland; specifying the composition, powers, and duties of the Task Force; providing for the staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations, including suggested constitutional and legislative changes, to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2015; and terminating the Act at the end of June 30, 2016.
Title
Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-03 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-21 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Boundaries
Committees and Commissions
Congress, U.S.
Elections
Elections, State Board of
General Assembly
Legislative Services, Department of
Planning, Department of
Reapportionment and Redistricting
Reports
State Government - General Assembly
Sunset
Committees and Commissions
Congress, U.S.
Elections
Elections, State Board of
General Assembly
Legislative Services, Department of
Planning, Department of
Reapportionment and Redistricting
Reports
State Government - General Assembly
Sunset