MD HB1217 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-11)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 505
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-11)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 505
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to adopt regulations to ensure that the Maryland Medical Assistance Program is in compliance with specified federal laws; providing that the Department is not required to adopt specified regulations for any changes that may be made through a process other than the regulatory process; requiring the regulations to include standards regarding treatment limitations for specialty mental health and substance use disorder services that comply with the federal laws; etc.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Specialty Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Services - Parity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-1) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-1) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 505 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-1) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {956682/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Federal Government
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Medical Assistance
Mental Health
Notices
Patients
Physicians
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Rules and Regulations
Substance Abuse
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Medical Assistance
Mental Health
Notices
Patients
Physicians
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Rules and Regulations
Substance Abuse