MD HB122 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 670
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 670
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the termination date to June 30, 2020, for specified provisions of the used vehicle inspection law applicable to the electronic submission of an inspection certificate.
Title
Motor Vehicles - Electronic Inspection Certificates for Used Vehicles - Sunset Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 670 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2017-02-24 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2017-02-21 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-21 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-20 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:15 p.m. |
2017-02-08 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-18 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Electronic Government
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Sunset
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Sunset
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections