MD HB1234 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Task Force on the Selective Moving of Overhead Utility Lines Underground; providing for the composition, chair, staff, and duties of the Task Force; specifying that a member of the Task Force may not receive compensation, but may receive specified reimbursement; requiring the Task Force, on or before specified dates, to submit preliminary and final reports to the Governor and the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Task Force on the Selective Moving of Overhead Utility Lines Underground
Sponsors
Del. Sam Arora [D] | Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. Alfred Carr [D] | Del. Bonnie Cullison [D] |
Del. James Gilchrist [D] | Del. Jolene Ivey [D] | Del. Anne Kaiser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-03-08 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-07 | Re-referred Economic Matters | |
2011-02-21 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB1234.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb1234f.pdf |