MD HB1249 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for a certain adjustment to the State share percentage for a county library capital project if a county's median household income is in the bottom quartile in the State and the State share percentage for a county library capital project is 50%; etc.
Title
Libraries - Capital Projects - State Share Adjustments
Sponsors
Del. Wendell Beitzel [R] | Del. Jason Buckel [R] | Del. Dana Jones [D] | Del. Susan McComas [R] |
Sen. Mike McKay [R] | Del. Brenda Thiam [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362 |
2022-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2022-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments {463521/1 Adopted |
2022-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2022-02-18 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB847 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Subjects
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Education - Miscellaneous
Libraries
Poverty
Reports
Sunset
Weights and Measures
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Education - Miscellaneous
Libraries
Poverty
Reports
Sunset
Weights and Measures