MD HB1266 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB921
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a dentist to collect oral saliva samples to screen for lead poisoning in individuals under the age of 19 years.
Title
Dentists - Saliva Lead Poisoning Screening Tests - Scope of Practice and Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-03-07 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
HB921 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Chemical Tests
Dentists
Disclosure
Examinations
Federal Government
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health Occupations
Laboratories
Medical Assistance
Minors
Notices
Dentists
Disclosure
Examinations
Federal Government
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health Occupations
Laboratories
Medical Assistance
Minors
Notices
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 4 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 4 | 510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |