MD HB1273 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-9)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 452
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-9)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 452
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a pharmacy benefits manager to allow a pharmacy or pharmacist to withdraw and resubmit certain claims within a certain number of days after a preliminary audit report is delivered or, if a pharmacy or pharmacist requests an internal audit, within a certain number of days after the conclusion of the internal appeals process.
Title
Health Insurance – Audits of Pharmacies or Pharmacists – Authorization to Withdraw and Resubmit Claims
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 452 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {126081/3 Adopted |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Claims
Health Insurance
Insurance - Health
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Time
Claims
Health Insurance
Insurance - Health
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Time