MD HB1275 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-22 - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-22 - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Elections to make specified statements of contributions and expenditures for specified petitions available on its Internet site; and requiring a person with whom a specified statement of contributions and expenditures for a specified petition is filed to forward a copy of the statement to the State Board within a specified period of time.
Title
Election Law - Petition Fund Reports - Available Online
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-20 | Third Reading Passed (93-42) | |
2012-03-18 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-17 | Special Order until 3/21 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted | |
2012-03-17 | Favorable with Amendments 275766/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-02-28 | Hearing 3/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | Re-referred Ways and Means | |
2012-02-14 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |