MD HB1278 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Elections to conduct an audit of the accuracy of the voting system's tabulation of votes by completing a certain audit of electronic ballot images and a certain manual audit after each statewide general election; requiring the State Board to complete a certain audit of electronic ballot images after each statewide primary election; requiring the State Board to submit a report to certain committees of the General Assembly by May 1, 2019, describing the resources required to complete the audit; etc.
Title
Election Law - Postelection Tabulation Audit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523 |
2018-04-05 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-04-05 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {754038/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2018-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {955868/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Ballots
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Government
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Time
Voting
Ballots
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Government
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Time
Voting