MD HB1284 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an applicant for a new or renewed authorization to catch crabs under a tidal fish license to supply, as part of the application, the applicant's home address and proof of residency.
Title
Tidal Fish Licenses - Authorization to Catch Crabs - Application Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | Senate | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {180810/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |