MD HB1288 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-19 - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-19 - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a county board of education to pay a public institution of higher education 50% of the tuition and fees charged to a student enrolled in a noncredit remedial education course under specified circumstances; requiring a county board to remit payment within a specified number of days on receipt of a specified notification from a public institution of higher education; etc.
Title
Accountability in Education Act of 2013
Sponsors
Del. Nancy Stocksdale [R] | Del. Susan Aumann [R] | Sen. Gail Bates [R] | Del. Joseph Boteler [R] |
Del. William Frank [R] | Del. John Wood [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-11 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Counties
Education
Education, Boards of
Fees
Higher Education
Local Government Mandates
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Records
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Tuition
Education
Education, Boards of
Fees
Higher Education
Local Government Mandates
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Records
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Tuition