MD HB1288 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Defining the term vocational certificate to include completion of a course of study that prepares an individual to work in a career field by taking credit-bearing courses or noncredit courses for purposes of establishing eligibility of foster care recipients for specified tuition waivers; and altering a specified requirement that specified foster care recipients and specified unaccompanied homeless youth apply for specified financial aid by a specified time.
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306 |
2016-04-09 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2016-04-09 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Special Order until later today (President) Adopted |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {274534/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2016-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {484965/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2016-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Foster Care
Grants
Higher Education
Indigent Persons
Job Training
Licenses
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Tuition
Youth
Grants
Higher Education
Indigent Persons
Job Training
Licenses
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Tuition
Youth