MD HB129 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in Maryland; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to specified public officials on or before October 1, 2014; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in Maryland
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (103-28) (Y: 103 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (103-28) (Y: 103 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (103-28) |
2013-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-20 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2013-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-17 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Attorneys
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Legal Aid
Reports
Sunset
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Legal Aid
Reports
Sunset