MD HB129 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the BayStat Program to be the BayTrack Program; and renaming the BayStat Subcabinet to be the Bay Cabinet.
Title
BayStat Program and BayStat Subcabinet - Renaming
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2017-02-06 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-18 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Chesapeake Bay
Coastal Bays
Committees and Commissions
Environmental Matters
Names
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Coastal Bays
Committees and Commissions
Environmental Matters
Names
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of