MD HB129 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 687
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 687
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to require that proposals requesting Behavioral Health Crisis Response Grant Program funding contain response standards that prioritize mobile crisis units over law enforcement when responding to individuals in crisis; defining "mobile crisis team" to include prioritizing limiting interaction of law enforcement with individuals in crisis; and requiring each public safety answering point to develop a written policy for calls involving an individual suffering an active mental health crisis.
Title
Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services and Public Safety Answering Points – Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Floor Amendment 743526/1 (Delegate Griffith) Rejected (Y: 43 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Floor Amendment 743526/1 (Delegate Griffith) Rejected (Y: 43 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 687 |
2022-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (92-39) |
2022-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | House | Floor Amendment {743526/1 (Delegate Griffith) Rejected (43-94) |
2022-03-16 | House | Motion Special Order until 3/17 (Delegate Griffith) Adopted |
2022-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {103321/1 Adopted |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-01-26 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 3:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2022-01-26 | House | Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) |
2022-01-18 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 2:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2022-01-18 | House | Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) |
2022-01-18 | House | Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary |
2021-10-29 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB12 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 688
Subjects
Emergency Services
Grants
Health, Department of
Law Enforcement
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Public Safety
Reports
Grants
Health, Department of
Law Enforcement
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Public Safety
Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 10 | 1401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 1 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |