MD HB129 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB330
Note: Carry Over of previous HB70
Note: Carry Over of previous HB70
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-03 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-03 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the conditions under which a lawsuit is considered a strategic lawsuit against public participation (SLAPP suit); altering the conditions under which a defendant in a SLAPP suit is not civilly liable for certain communications; establishing certain standards and requirements relating to a motion to dismiss an alleged SLAPP suit; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2023-03-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-39) |
2023-02-28 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-02-27 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2023-01-17 | House | Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m. |
2023-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB129 (Carry Over) 2023-03-03 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
HB70 (Carry Over) 2022-02-18 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
SB619 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-14 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
HB70 (Carry Over) 2022-02-18 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
SB619 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-14 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Commerce and Business
Communications
Constitution, U.S.
Court Costs
Courts
defendants
Liability
Testimony
Unfair Trade Practices
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Commerce and Business
Communications
Constitution, U.S.
Court Costs
Courts
defendants
Liability
Testimony
Unfair Trade Practices
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 5 | 807 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |