MD HB1291 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB437
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-10 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-10 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the composition of the Maryland Zero Emission Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Council; and altering the dates by which the Council must submit interim reports of its work and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly.
Title
Maryland Zero Emission Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Council - Membership
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2023-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-14) |
2023-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {213624/1 Adopted |
2023-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-04-05 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2023-02-27 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
HB1291 (Carry Over) 2023-04-10 - Referred Rules
SB950 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-10 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
SB950 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-10 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Electric Motor Vehicles
Energy Administration
Governor
Public Service Commission
Reports
Transportation
Transportation, Department of
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Electric Motor Vehicles
Energy Administration
Governor
Public Service Commission
Reports
Transportation
Transportation, Department of
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2011 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2013 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2015 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2019 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2020 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2021 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |